Estate of Anton Pat Barrett, et al. v. City of Vallejo, et al.

Plaintiff: Estate of Anton Pat Barrett, Anton Frank Barrett, Pashaney Barrett and Tasha Perry
Defendant: City of Vallejo, Sean Kenney, Waylon Boyce and Mark Thompson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00846
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sonoma
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/18/13. (Kaminski, H)
December 2, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on December 1, 2014 re 14 . The Pre-Trial Scheduling Order is amended so that the parties shall make expert witness disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) by January 23, 2015 and that all discovery shall be completed by February 23, 2015. (Rivas, A)
January 28, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/28/2015 GRANTING 17 Motion for Order Shortening Time; SETTING the Motion Hearing on 16 Motion to Compel for 2/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Del aney; ORDERING that any opposition be filed by 2/2/2015 at 12:00 PM; CAUTIONING non-party witness Stacey Madkins that a failure to file an opposition and appear at said hearing may result in an order of contempt and/or sanctions issued against her; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this order on Stacey Madkins, 915 Waterford Avenue, Stockton, CA 95206. (Michel, G.)
February 5, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/5/2015 ORDERING that the 16 motion for contempt is CONTINUED for hearing on 2/25/2015 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom no. 24. Witness Stacy Madkins is directed to personally appear at the hearing and is cautioned that failure to appear may result in issuance of a warrant for her arrest. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Stacy Madkins, 915 Waterford Ave., Stockton, CA 95206. Defense counsel is also directed to personally serve a copy of this order on Stacy Madkins. The 16 motion to compel is GRANTED. Witness Stacy Madkins shall appear for deposition on 2/13/2015 at 10:00 a.m. at Sherwood Executive Center, 5250 Claremont Avenue, Stockton, CA 95207. Th e witness is cautioned that failure to appear at the deposition may result in a citation of contempt and imposition of monetary sanctions. Defense counsel shall file a letter brief no later than 2/17/2015 advising the court whether the witness deposition was completed. Ruling on the motion for contempt and defendants' request for attorneys' fees and expenses is deferred pending completion of the deposition of Stacy Madkins. (Zignago, K.)
February 9, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/9/2015 GRANTING 24 & 25 Motions to Shorten Time. Opposition, if any, to defendants' 23 Motion to Strike and 26 Motion to Compel shall be filed no later than 2/17/2015 at 12:00 p.m. Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than 2/18/2015 at 12:00 p.m. The motion shall thereafter stand submitted. (Donati, J) Modified on 2/10/2015 (Owen, K).
February 18, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/18/2015. Court finds the belated disclosure of plaintiff's expert is neither substantially justified nor harmless. Defendants' 23 Motion to Strike plaintiffs' expert is theref ore GRANTED. Plaintiffs' 26 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part. No later than 2/23/2015, defendants shall produce documents identified in proposed [30-2] Protective Order at 2:5-3:4 (at p. 10-11). Said documents shall be produced subject to provisions of proposed [30-2] Protective Order (at p. 9-13). Defendants directed to submit proposed Protective Order in Word format for signature by Judge Delaney. The remainder of the 26 Motion to Compel is DENIED. (Marciel, M) (Main Document 34 replaced on 2/18/2015) (Marciel, M).
February 19, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/18/15 ORDERING the February 25, 2015 hearing on the motion for contempt is vacated; the court finds that imposition of monetary sanctions in the circumstances of this case is not warranted and defendants' request 16 is therefore denied; the Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Stacy Madkins, 915 Waterford Ave., Stockton, CA 95206. (Becknal, R)
February 20, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/19/15. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Anton Pat Barrett, et al. v. City of Vallejo, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Anton Pat Barrett
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anton Frank Barrett
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pashaney Barrett
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Perry
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waylon Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]