Townsend v. Atascadero State Hospital

Respondent: Atascadero State Hospital
Petitioner: Rebio Ronnie Townsend
Case Number: 2:2013cv00859
Filed: May 2, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/27/13 ordering within 14 days from the date of this order respondent shall file and serve a responsive pleading in this matter and shall show cause in writing why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file the answer or motion to dismiss timely. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of this order on Michael Patrick Farrell, Attorney General. (cc: Michael Farrell, Attorney General)(Plummer, M)
September 18, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/17/13 ORDERING that the 18 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED; Respondents answer to the petition is deemed timely; and Petitioner shall file a traverse, if any, within 30 days of the date of service of this order.(Dillon, M)
May 27, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 05/27/14 ORDERING Audrey King is substituted for the previous respondent, Atascadero State Hospital. The clerk shall assign a district judge to this case as both sides have not consented to the undersigned presiding pursuant to 28 USC section 636(c). Also, RECOMMENDING that the petition be dismissed in part and summarily denied in part. Judgment should be entered for respondent. The undersigned finds that no certificate of appealability should issue in this case. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 7, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/7/2014 DENYING petitioner's 31 motion. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Atascadero State Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Atascadero State Hospital
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rebio Ronnie Townsend
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]