Murray v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kellan Bryant Murray
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00866
Filed: May 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
 
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/10/2013 APPROVING the Request for an Extension of Time; ORDERING the plaintiff to file his Motion for Summary Judgment by 10/16/2013. (Michel, G)
December 17, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/17/13 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to file a Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Answer is EXTENDED from 11/18/13 to 12/23/2013.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 20, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/19/14 DENYING 15 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A)
May 7, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/6/2013 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve New Case Documents in Social Security Cases; ORDERING Plaintiff the submit to the U.S. Marshal, within 14 days, a c ompleted Summons, and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint; ORDERING the Plaintiff to file a Statement with the court, within 14 days, that said documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process, without prepayment of costs, within 60 days. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Murray v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Theophous H. Reagans
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellan Bryant Murray
Represented By: Ann M. Cerney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]