Fehrenbacher v. Wells Fargo, N.A., et al.

Defendant: Hines Sacramento Wells Fargo Center GP, LLC, Hines Interest Limited Partnership, Wells Fargo, N.A. and Hines Sacramento Wells Fargo Center LP
Plaintiff: Steve Fehrenbacher
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00869
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 11 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/18/13: The deadline shall be extended for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint through and including the date of July 22, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
August 5, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/2/2013 DISMISSING, with prejudice, Defendant Wells Fargo, N.A. (Michel, G)
June 27, 2013 8 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/25/2013 EXTENDING TIME for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 2 Complaint to 7/8/2013. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fehrenbacher v. Wells Fargo, N.A., et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines Sacramento Wells Fargo Center GP, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines Interest Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines Sacramento Wells Fargo Center LP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Fehrenbacher
Represented By: Russell S. Humphrey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]