Braun v. Cellco Partnership, et al.

Defendant: Airtouch Cellular and Cellco Partnership
Plaintiff: Nathan Braun
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00872
Filed: May 3, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 12 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 11 for Dismissal signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/13/2013. Defendant Airtouch Cellular is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice, from action. (Marciel, M)
May 21, 2014 16 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER re: 15 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 5/21/14 AMENDING 14 Scheduling Order to Allow for Mediation. Trial RESET for 2/10/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb, Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 12/8/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Meuleman, A)
June 2, 2014 18 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 17 to amend Pretrial Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/5/2014. The deadline to file Motions shall be CONTINUED to 9/15/2014 subject to all Deposition having been re-noticed and taken no later than 8/19/2014, subject to Objections, Motions for Protective Order, or other Court Order. All other deadlines and dates set forth in 14 Pretrial Scheduling Order and Court's 5/21/2014 16 Order stand. (Marciel, M)
August 5, 2014 22 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 21 for DISMISSAL signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/5/2014. Parties agree that this action be DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1). Parties shall also bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Braun v. Cellco Partnership, et al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airtouch Cellular
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Catherine Suzanne Nasser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Braun
Represented By: Robin Kerry Perkins
Represented By: Natalia D. Asbill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]