Fernandez et al v. Obesity Research Institute, LLC et al

Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Continuity Products, LLC, Obesity Research Institute, LLC, Henny den Uijl and Bryan Corlett
Plaintiff: Rhonda Stanley, Alfonso Mendoza and DeMarie Fernandez
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00975
Filed: May 16, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/3/2013 DENYING 22 Motion for an Order to Show Cause without prejudice. Plaintiffs may refile their motion in compliance with LR 231. It is further ORDERED that 22 Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs should, if they choose to do so, file a properly noticed motion in compliance with LR 230. (Donati, J)
July 5, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/3/2013 ORDERING Hearings on Motions 10 and 12 RESET for 8/8/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Waggoner, D)
August 28, 2013 46 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/28/2013 ORDERING the Court DENIES defendants' 20 motion to change venue, and plaintiffs' 29 motion for preliminary injunction; Defendants' 21 motion to STAY is GRANTED, not later than 10 days after the proceedings are concluded in the Duran action, defendants are directed to inform this Court of the status of this case and move to lift the stay; the Court DENIES defendants' 10 , 12 motion to dismiss and plaintiffs' 26 motion to appoint class counsel, without prejudice and directes the parties to refile their motions when the stay is lifted, if the parties choose to do so. CASE STAYED (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fernandez et al v. Obesity Research Institute, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Frank C. Rothrock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continuity Products, LLC
Represented By: Scott J. Ferrell
Represented By: James B. Hardin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obesity Research Institute, LLC
Represented By: Scott J. Ferrell
Represented By: James B. Hardin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henny den Uijl
Represented By: Scott J. Ferrell
Represented By: James B. Hardin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Corlett
Represented By: Scott J. Ferrell
Represented By: James B. Hardin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Stanley
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonso Mendoza
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeMarie Fernandez
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Westcot
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]