Camou v. California Medical Facility

Defendant: California Medical Facility
Plaintiff: Michael Camou
Case Number: 2:2013cv01031
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/18/2013 DIRECTING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 23, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/23/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013) [Transferred from cand on 5/24/2013.]
May 30, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/29/2013 GRANTING plaintiff 30 days to file a complaint; plaintiff shall also submit, within 30 days, the application to proceed IFP or the $350.00 filing fee; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a civil rights action form and an ifp application.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camou v. California Medical Facility
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Facility
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Camou
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]