Briscoe v. Valenzuela

Respondent: E. Valenzuela
Petitioner: Darryl Lee Briscoe
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01185
Filed: June 13, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
 
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/21/13 ORDERING that Petitioners application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted; and the Clerk of Court is directed to randomly assign a district judge to this action. In addition, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
July 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/22/13 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to a) redesignate the undersigned's findings and recommendations filed on 06/24/13 10 as an order; and b) withdraw the assignment of a district judge to this action; and for the reasons stated in this court's order filed 06/24/13 10 this action is dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (cc: KJM) (Plummer, M) Modified on 7/23/2013 (Plummer, M).
June 12, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the U.S. District Court, Eastern District of California, FORTHWITH. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/12/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).[Transferred from cand on 6/13/2013.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Briscoe v. Valenzuela
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E. Valenzuela
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darryl Lee Briscoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]