Turk v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roderick Turk
Case Number: 2:2013cv01248
Filed: June 23, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/14/14: Within fourteen (14) days of this order, plaintiff's counsel shall show cause why he should not be personally sanctioned in the amount of $500 based on his failure to comply with the court's scheduling deadlines and orders. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, plaintiff shall file his statement concerning consent/decline of magistrate judge jurisdiction and shall file his motion for summary judgment. (Kaminski, H)
February 18, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/18/2014 ORDERING the plaintiff's counsel to personally pay to the Clerk of Court $250.00 in monetary sanctions based on his failure to comply with the court's scheduling deadlines and orders; ORDERING the parties to file a Stipulation of Dismissal of action pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) within fourteen (14) days; ALTERNATIVELY ORDERING the Commissioner of Social Security to file an opposition to the 15 Request for Dismissal within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G)
February 26, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and PROPOSED 17 for Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/2014. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Plaintiff's prior 15 Request for Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT. Clerk directed to VACATE all dates and CLOSE this case. (Marciel, M)
July 23, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/23/13: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (cc:USM)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turk v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Carolyn B. Chen, GOVT
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Turk
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]