Harmon v. Commissioner of Social Security

Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kim R. Harmon
Case Number: 2:2013cv01374
Filed: July 10, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/14 re: 13 EXTENDING time until 2/20/14 for defendant to file opposition to 12 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( Responses due by 2/20/2014.) (Meuleman, A)
September 19, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/18/14: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 12 is granted. Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment 15 is denied. The Commissioner's decision is reversed. This matter is remanded for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Kaminski, H)
November 21, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 19 for award and payment of attorney fees and expenses pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/20/2014. Plaintiff Kim Harmon is awarded fees and costs in amount of $3,300.00 under EAJA and costs in amount of $400.00. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Paul Sachelari, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim R. Harmon
Represented By: Marc V. Kalagian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]