Freeman v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: William Freeman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv01388
Filed: July 11, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/6/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of thirty days, through 1/6/2014, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment. (Zignago, K.)
January 7, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/6/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of thirty days, through Wednesday, 2/5/2014, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 22, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/21/2014. Plaintiff's {17] Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and Commissioner's 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Order. (Marciel, M)
December 2, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/18/2014 AWARDING the plaintiff attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), in the amount of SEVEN THOUSAND FOUR HUNDRED DOLLARS ($7,400.00); AWARDING the plaintiff costs under 28 U.S.C. § 1920 in the amount of FOUR HUNDRED DOLLARS ($400.00). (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Freeman
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Paul Sachelari, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]