McIntyre v. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OC10 et al

Defendant: Does, The Bank of New York Mellon and Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OC10
Plaintiff: Phillip McIntyre
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01597
Filed: August 2, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
 
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/25/2013. Status Conference set for 2/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB). No later than 2/5/2014, all parties shall Status Reports (or Joint Status Report). Plaintiff directed to serve a copy of this on all defendants. (Marciel, M)
July 3, 2014 29 Featured Case FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/3/2014: Recommending that the Motion to Dismiss 14 be granted; plaintiff's Amended Complaint 23 be denied; and plaintiff be granted 30 days to file an amended complaint. Referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Owen, K)
July 30, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/30/14 ORDERING that the proposed Findings and Recommendations filed 7/3/14, are ADOPTED; Defendant's motion to dismiss, 14 is granted; Plaintiff's amended complaint, construed as a motio n to amend, 23 is denied; and Plaintiff is granted thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint as provided in the magistrate judge's 7/3/14 findings and recommendations. The amended complaint must bear the docket number assigned to this case and must be labeled as an "Amended Complaint." Failure to timely file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of this action. (Becknal, R)
November 18, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/14/13 ORDERING the transfer of this case to this district was appropriate and plaintiff's 6 motion is therefore denied. (Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McIntyre v. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OC10 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OC10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip McIntyre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]