Spradlin v. Kasco Corporation

Plaintiff: Anthony Chad Spradlin
Defendant: Kasco Corporation
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02260
Filed: October 30, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/13/13 GRANTING Defendant a second extension of time up to and including 12/27/2013 to file a response to the complaint. (Donati, J)
December 30, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/27/2013 GRANTING the plaintiff leave to file a First Amended Complaint; ORDERING the defendant to file a responsive pleading within twenty-one days (21) of the filing of the First Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
February 26, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/26/2014 ALLOWING Plaintiff Anthony Spradlin to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint. (Michel, G)
March 11, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/2014 VACATING the 3/13/2014 Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Donati, J)
March 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/2014 ORDERING the defendant to respond to the 21 Second Amended Complaint by 4/11/2014; STAYING these proceedings pending the Court's consideration of the anticipated Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Michel, G)
April 8, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/4/14 DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 24 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Gary Allen, David Samuelson, Anthony Chad Spradlin. Because the parties have indicated that the Court's d enial of their joint request to seal may affect the settlement, the Court permits the parties 14 days from the entry of this order to withdraw or amend their stipulation regarding settlement. If the parties do not withdraw or amend their stipulati on, the Court shall file the documents in the public record. If the parties withdraw their stipulation regarding settlement, the parties are ordered to file an updated joint status report so that the Court can reset pretrial and trial dates in this action. (Meuleman, A)
April 14, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/10/2014 ORDERING The Court, thus having approved of the settlement of the claims in this matter, hereby DISMISSES with Prejudice all of the individual claims which were bro ught on behalf of Plaintiffs Gary Allen, David Samuelson and Anthony Spradlin, including Plaintiffs' individual PAGA claims. This Court further APPROVES the release by Plaintiffs of any claims and potential claims as set forth in the Settlement Agreement, including, but not limited to, any claims against Defendant for wages under the FLSA. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
November 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/19/2013 ORDERING that an initial three-week extension for Defendant to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Defendant's response is now due on 12/13/2013. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Spradlin v. Kasco Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chad Spradlin
Represented By: Rory Cosby Quintana
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kasco Corporation
Represented By: Laura J. Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]