United States of America v. Approximately $92,777.78 in U.S. Currency, seized from River City Bank Account Number 0220074437

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $92,777.78 in U.S. Currency, seized from River City Bank Account Number 0220074437
 
Case Number: 2:2013mc00013
Filed: February 12, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2013 2 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/15/2013 ORDERING the United States to file a Complaint for Forfeiture against the defendant funds and/or to obtain an Indictment alleging that the defendant funds are subject to forfeiture by 3/20/2013. (Michel, G)
March 28, 2013 4 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/27/13 EXTENDING time to file complaint for forfeiture in rem to 4/19/13. (Manzer, C)
April 23, 2013 6 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/19/13. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $92,777.78 in U.S. Currency, seized from River City Bank Account Number 0220074437
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $92,777.78 in U.S. Currency, seized from River City Bank Account Number 0220074437
Represented By: Patrick Keith Hanly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]