United States of America v. 1964 Chevrolet Impala, License No. 5XDA830 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 1964 Chevrolet Impala, License No. 5XDA830 and Approximately $20,940.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2013mc00040
Filed: April 12, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/17/2013 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant vehicle and defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant vehicle and defendant currency are subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 6/28/2013. (Zignago, K.)
June 26, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 3 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/26/2013 ORDERING that that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant vehicle and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant vehicle is subject to forfeiture is extended to 7/29/2013. (Kirksey Smith, K)
July 9, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/8/13. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 1964 Chevrolet Impala, License No. 5XDA830 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1964 Chevrolet Impala, License No. 5XDA830
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $20,940.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.