United States of America v. Approximately $122,000.00 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $122,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2013mc00072
Filed: July 24, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/24/14 ORDERING that the Deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 7/25/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 25, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/24/14. Upon entry of this Consent Judgment of Forfeiture, $99,000.00 of the Approximately $122,000.00 in U.S. Currency, together with any interest that may have accrued on the total amount seized, shall be forfeited to the United States pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 881(a)(6), to be disposed of according to law. Upon entry of this Consent Judgment of Forfeiture, but no later than 60 days thereafter, $23,000.00 of the Approximately $122,000.00 in U.S. Currency shall be returned to claimant Gregory Thomas Phelan. All parties will bear their own costs and attorney's fees. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 5, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/2/2013 ORDERING the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture by 10/31/2013. (Michel, G)
October 31, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/30/13: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall shall be extended to January 29, 2014.(Kaminski, H)
January 29, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/27/2014 ORDERING the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall shall be extended to 3/28/2014.(Donati, J)
March 28, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/27/14: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to May 27, 2014. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $122,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $122,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]