Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. et al v. Corey et al

Plaintiff: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc., Dale L. Curtice, Jr., Nelson Greenwade, Sr., Lance Henning, Leo T. Jolin, Barry Vun Cannon, Johnny West, Richard M. Hunter and Russell A. Short
Defendant: Richard W. Corey, Mary D. Nichols, Matt Rodriguez and California Air Resources Board
 
Case Number: 2:2014cv00186
Filed: December 6, 2013
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 16 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for defendants to respond to complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2014. (Hernandez, M)
January 22, 2014 18 Featured Case ORDER to Relate Actions and to Reassign Judges; New case number is: 2:14-cv-186 MCE GGH, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/22/14. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 5, 2014 25 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/5/14 ORDERING that Defendants' Rule 12(b) motion shall be filed on 1/27/14; Plaintiffs opposition to said motion is to be filed on or before 3/27/14; Defendants' reply is to be filed on or before 4/10/14; the hearing on said motion is scheduled for 4/17/14; the joint status report will be due sixty (60) days from the date of the Court's ruling on Defendants' 12(b) motion; and the Rule 26(a) initial disclosures are stayed pending the Court's ruling on the Defendants' motion. (Becknal, R)
March 28, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/27/2014 DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants Richard W. Corey, Mary D. Nichols in their personal capacities only; ORDERING that Defendants Richard W. Corey, Mary D. Nichols, Matt Rodriguez remain defendants in their official capacities; DENYING AS MOOT 21 Motion to Dismiss. (Michel, G)
March 28, 2014 29 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/27/2014 ORDERING the defendants to file their F.R.Cv.P. 12(c) Motion by 5/15/2014; ORDERING the parties to file a joint status report sixty (60) days from the Court's ruling on said motion; STAYING the Rule 26(a) initial disclosures pending the Court's ruling on the defendants Rule 12(c) motion. (Michel, G)
May 1, 2014 32 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER 31 re Briefing Schedule of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/30/2014. The Motion shall be filed on or before 5/15/2014. Plaintiff's Opposition shall be filed on or before 6/5/2014. Defendants' Reply due on or before 6/19/2014. The Motion Hearing shall be scheduled for 6/26/2014 at 2:00 PM. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. et al v. Corey et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Cohen, PHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David A. Cohen, PHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Paul D. Cullen, JrPHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Paul D. Cullen, SrPHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale L. Curtice, Jr.
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Greenwade, Sr.
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Henning
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo T. Jolin
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Vun Cannon
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny West
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard M. Hunter
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell A. Short
Represented By: Brian C Leighton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Corey
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Covington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary D. Nichols
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Covington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Rodriguez
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Covington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Air Resources Board
Represented By: Courtney Suzanne Covington
Represented By: Nicholas Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]