State of Missouri, et al v. Harris

Defendant: Karen Ross and Kamala D. Harris
Plaintiff: State of Missouri, State of Nebraska, State of Alabama, Commonwealth of Kentucky, State of Oklahoma and Terry E. Branstad
 
Case Number: 2:2014cv00341
Filed: February 3, 2014
 
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/1/14 ORDERING that defendants and defendant-intervenors' motions to dismiss for lack of standing are GRANTED without leave to amend. Plaintiffs' first amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this action. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
June 3, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/2/2014 GRANTING 27 , 33 Motions to Intervene. (Michel, G)
July 1, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/30/2014 GRANTING Amici I's 44 Motion for leave to file an Amicus Brief; ORDERING Amici I to file their brief in the form attached to their motion within two days; GRANTING Amici II's 63 Motion for leave to file an Amicus Brief; ORDERING Amici II to file their brief in the form attached to their motion within two days. (Michel, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: State of Missouri, et al v. Harris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Ross
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Susan K. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Missouri
Represented By: Darryl J. Horowitt(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John Andrew Hirth, PHV(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Darryl J. Horowitt(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alabama
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Darryl J. Horowitt(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Darryl J. Horowitt(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Oklahoma
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Darryl J. Horowitt(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry E. Branstad
Represented By: Sherrie Marie Flynn(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Darryl J. Horowitt(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]