Lena v. Davis, et al.

Plaintiff: Michael Angelo Lena
Defendant: C Davis, Wilson and Fred Foulk
Case Number: 2:2014cv01121
Filed: May 6, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/2/14. (notewarelS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service) (notewarelS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/6/2014.]
October 15, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/15/14 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Michael Lena and forward payment to the court until the balance is p aid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial). (Dillon, M)
December 5, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/05/14 ordering that the motion filed by plaintiff on 11/24/14 35 is denied without prejudice. (Plummer, M)
May 11, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/11/15. (Plummer, M)
May 19, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/19/15 ORDERING that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendants' 02/10/15 motion to dism iss 50 be granted. Plaintiff's remaining claims for denial of access to courts against defendants Davis, Wilson, and Foulk be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted; and this case be closed. MOTION to DISMISS 50 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lena v. Davis, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Angelo Lena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Foulk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.