Brooktrails Township Community Services District v. United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development et al

Defendant: Joseph Shunk and United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development
Plaintiff: Brooktrails Township Community Services District
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv05576
Filed: October 30, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2012 10 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER extending time to respond to complaint and continuing case management conference filed by United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2013 02:00 PM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on December 19, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
January 31, 2013 13 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on January 31, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
February 25, 2013 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 Stipulation filed by United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development, Joseph Shunk, ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on February 25, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brooktrails Township Community Services District v. United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Shunk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Rural Development
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooktrails Township Community Services District
Represented By: Jennifer Marie O'Brien
Represented By: Christopher James Neary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]