Faizan Corporation v. Nationwide Insurance Company

Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Faizan Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00650
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Mendocino
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court **DISREGARD. CASE NUMBER IS INCORRECT ON THIS DOCUMENT. FOR CORRECT ORDER, SEE DOCKET NO. 22 .** ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO UPON CONSENT AND SETTING CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/30/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO UPON CONSENT AND SETTING CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT DATES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
June 6, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [Reassigned Case]. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/6/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 10, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING DISCOVERY REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE NANDOR J. VADAS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/10/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 12, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 27 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint filed by Faizan Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/12/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
August 5, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/5/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faizan Corporation v. Nationwide Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Burnite
Represented By: Laura E. Fannon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faizan Corporation
Represented By: Brian Scott Momsen
Represented By: Brian Charles Carter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]