Ayala et al v. Pacific Maritime Association et al

Plaintiff: Jose Ayala, Deandre Whitten, Leroy Phillips, Gonzalo Torres, Jose Linarez, Kimani Stafford and Joseph Lawton
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association, International Longshore & Warehouse Union and International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 13
Case Number: 3:2008cv00119
Filed: January 7, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Reporting/Disclosure
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2009 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion for Settlement; finding as moot 126 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
July 1, 2009 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, vacating trial date, and setting case management conference for July 20, 2009 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on July 1, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
July 20, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing defendant Pacific Maritime Association. Pacific Maritime Association terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/20/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
November 5, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Summary Judgment (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
December 1, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Mark Sullivan to appear by telephone at the case management conference on 12/07/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/01/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
March 24, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue the Case Management Conference to 6/7/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/24/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
June 8, 2010 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Dates for Trial (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
September 23, 2010 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to show cause re: 173 172 . Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/23/2010. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 29, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FILINGS FOLLOWING TAXATION OF DEFENDANTS' BILLS OF COSTS; re 206 210 209 208 (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
December 14, 2011 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AWARD OF COSTS by Judge Thelton Henderson granting 213 Motion for Retaxation of Costs. ; granting 235 Motion for Retaxation of Costs. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
September 12, 2008 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing plaintiffs' counsel to appear by telephone at the CMC. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/10/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing defendant's counsel to appear by telephone at the CMC. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/11/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
January 13, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES AND SETTING HEARING: Discovery Hearing set for 1/20/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/13/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009) Modified on 1/13/2009 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY HEARING re 74 Letter, filed by Gonzalo Torres, Deandre Whitten, Joseph Lawton, Kimani Stafford, Jose Ayala, Leroy Phillips, Jose Linarez, 80 Letter filed by Gonzalo Torres, Deandre Whitten, Joseph Lawton, Kimani Stafford, Jose Ayala, Leroy Phillips, Jose Linarez, 75 Letter filed by International Longshore & Warehouse Union. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 22, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2009)
February 6, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend date to file responses to complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/06/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
April 17, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING EMERGENCY DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 17, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 30, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions 91 . Hearing set for 6/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/30/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayala et al v. Pacific Maritime Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ayala
Represented By: Mark Francis Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deandre Whitten
Represented By: Mark Francis Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Phillips
Represented By: Mark Francis Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Torres
Represented By: Mark Francis Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Linarez
Represented By: Mark Francis Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimani Stafford
Represented By: Mark Francis Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lawton
Represented By: Mark Francis Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Maritime Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore & Warehouse Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore & Warehouse Union, Local 13
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]