Byers et al v. Service Employees International Union et al

Plaintiff: Rosie Byers, Ella Raiford, Martha Vazquez, Mel Garcia and J. Michael Torres
Defendant: Service Employees International Union, Andrew L. Stern, Mary Kay Henry and Thomas V. Debruin
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv01870
Filed: April 8, 2008
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Reporting/Disclosure Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Filing of Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/3/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
January 7, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re filing of third amended complaint and continuance of case management conference from 1/23/09 to 4/17/09, Motions terminated: 46 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complain filed by Service Employees International Union, Thomas V. Debruin, Anna Burger, Mary Kay Henry.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/7/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
February 17, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Third Amended Complaint (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 25, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Filing of Fourth Amended Complaint, and setting Case Management Conference for 7/9/09 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/25/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
April 1, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Byers et al v. Service Employees International Union et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosie Byers
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Raiford
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Vazquez
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mel Garcia
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Michael Torres
Represented By: Jonathan H. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew L. Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kay Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas V. Debruin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]