Robinson v. Secretary of State Debra Bowen et al Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Senator McCain was born in the Commonwealth of Panama in 1936 and is therefore not eligible to be President of the United States under Article II of the U.S. Constitution\'s natural-born requirement.

Plaintiff: Markham Robinson
Defendant: Secretary of State Debra Bowen, The Republican National Committee, The Republican Party of California and John McCain
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv03836
Filed: August 11, 2008
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Constitutional - State Statute Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: James Larson
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2008 10
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markham Robinson. Secretary of State Debra Bowen served on 8/15/2008, answer due 9/4/2008. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 11
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markham Robinson. The Republican Party of California served on 8/15/2008, answer due 9/4/2008. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 12
MOTION to Shorten Time re Plaitniff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Markham Robinson. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 13 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup denying 6 Ex Parte Application ; denying 12 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 19, 2008 14
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order Setting Hearing served on All Parties on August 18, 2008, filed by Markham Robinson. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 19, 2008 15
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua David Hess (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Notice of Appearance)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 19, 2008 16
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markham Robinson. John McCain served on 8/16/2008, answer due 9/5/2008. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 19, 2008 17
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Markham Robinson. The Republican National Committee served on 8/16/2008, answer due 9/5/2008. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 20, 2008 18
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Herbert Bell, Jr on behalf of Defendant California Republican Party (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service - Notice of Appearance and Compliance of Defendant California Republican Party)(Bell, Charles) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 20, 2008 19
Brief Submission of Defendants Republican National Committee and Senator John McCain Regarding Scheduling filed byThe Republican National Committee, John McCain. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Submission Regarding Scheduling)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 11, 2008 1
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (Summons Issued) against Secretary of State Debra Bowen, The Republican National Committee, The Republican Party of California, Senator John McCain ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611022301.). Filed byMarkham Robinson. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008) (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2008 20
Memorandum in Opposition 19 to Defendants' Brief of August 20, 2008 regarding scheduling filed by Markham Robinson. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/20/2008) Modified on 8/21/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2008 21 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 21, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 22, 2008 22
REQUEST RE BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 22, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 21, 2008 23
Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 8/21/2008). Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2008 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by 8/28/08; opp 9/4/08; reply 9/8/08. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2008)
August 25, 2008 24
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Dismissing in Part Plaintiff's Complaint by Markham Robinson, John McCain. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Stipulation)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 20, 2008 25
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Matthew McGill, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611022626.) filed by The Republican National Committee, John McCain. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 26, 2008 26
NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Robert Barankin and Compliance of Defendant Secretary of State Debra Bowen (Barankin, Nathan) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
August 28, 2008 27
MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Republican National Committee, The Republican Party of California, John McCain. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2008 07:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 COS on Motion to Dismiss)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
September 2, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
September 4, 2008 29
Memorandum in Opposition re 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed byMarkham Robinson. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
August 11, 2008 2
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/12/2008. Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2008 at 10:30 A.M. before Chief Magistrate Judge James Larson. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Court Standing Order)(ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
September 4, 2008 30
MEMORANDUM in Opposition 3 to Plaintiff's Motion for A Preliminary Injunction filed by The Republican National Committee, The Republican Party of California, John McCain. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service on Opposition)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified on 9/5/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2008 31
Memorandum in Opposition 1 to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declatory and Injunctive Relief filed by Secretary of State Debra Bowen. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cathy Mitchell, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Barankin, Nathan) (Filed on 9/4/2008) Modified on 9/5/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. McGill. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 8, 2008 33
REPLY to Response to Motion re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byMarkham Robinson. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 34
RESPONSE in Support 27 of Their Motion to Dismiss filed by The Republican National Committee, The Republican Party of California, John McCain. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Thereon)(Hess, Joshua) (Filed on 9/8/2008) Modified on 9/9/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2008 35
MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Markham Robinson. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 11, 2008 36
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 9/11/2008) re 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Republican National Committee, John McCain, The Republican Party of California, 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Markham Robinson. Motions taken under submission. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2008)
September 11, 2008 37
Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default filed by Secretary of State Debra Bowen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Barankin, Nathan) (Filed on 9/11/2008) Modified on 9/12/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2008 38
Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Deborah Bowen (Related documents(s) 35 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 16, 2008 39 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Alsup denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 27 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 16, 2008 40
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 16, 2008. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
October 3, 2008 41 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
August 13, 2008 4
Declaration of Gregory S. Walston in Support of 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byMarkham Robinson. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 5
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Markham Robinson re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 4 Declaration in Support (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 6
Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Markham Robinson. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 15, 2008 7
First MOTION to Reassign Case filed by Markham Robinson. (Walston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 8
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/15/08. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Robinson v. Secretary of State Debra Bowen et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markham Robinson
Represented By: Gregory S. Walston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Debra Bowen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republican National Committee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Republican Party of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McCain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]