Cheah IP LLC v. Plaxo, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cheah IP LLC
Defendant: Plaxo, Inc., Comcast Interactive Media, LLC and Comcast Corporation
Counter-claimant: Plaxo, Inc., Comcast Interactive Media, LLC and Comcast Corporation
Counter-defendant: Cheah IP LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv04872
Filed: October 28, 2008
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 99 Declaration in Support, filed by Comcast Corporation, Comcast Interactive Media, LLC, Plaxo, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
May 4, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 81 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order; Denying 85 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; and Denying 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
November 17, 2008 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/17/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008)
January 27, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 72 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Cheah IP LLC, Comcast Corporation, Comcast Interactive Media, LLC, Plaxo, Inc., Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/27/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
February 24, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/24/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
March 26, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED SCHEDULE re 79 Stipulation, filed by Cheah IP LLC, Comcast Corporation, Comcast Interactive Media, LLC, Plaxo, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/26/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
April 6, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling hearing on 81 , 85 Cross-Motions for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/2009. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cheah IP LLC v. Plaxo, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheah IP LLC
Represented By: Steven C. Schroer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaxo, Inc.
Represented By: Jill Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Interactive Media, LLC
Represented By: Jill Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Jill Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Plaxo, Inc.
Represented By: Chung Gyun Suh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Comcast Interactive Media, LLC
Represented By: Chung Gyun Suh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Chung Gyun Suh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Cheah IP LLC
Represented By: Steven C. Schroer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]