Pon v. Peir 1 Imports, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tiffany Pon
Defendant: Peir 1 Imports, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00420
Filed: January 29, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Request of Plaintiff's Counsel to Withdraw. Signed by Judge Hamilton on June 12, 2009. (pjhlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 30, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 MOTION to Continue The Initial Case Managment Conference And Association Deadlines filed by Pier 1 Imports, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009) Modified on 3/15/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (ENE) re 22 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting ENE filed by Pier 1 Imports, Inc., Case referred to early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/17/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009) Modified on 3/15/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/9/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
October 27, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/27/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
November 3, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/30/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
March 2, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Limited Extension of Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/1/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/1/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
March 23, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 MOTION to Continue Discovery Motions filed by Tiffany Pon. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/23/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010) Modified on 3/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FAILURE TO EFILE re 1 Complaint filed by Tiffany Pon. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/26/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
April 22, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/22/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pon v. Peir 1 Imports, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Pon
Represented By: M. Van Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peir 1 Imports, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]