The American Automobile Association, Inc. v. Darba Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Defendant: Darba Enterprises, INc. and Darrin Bagnuolo
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00510
Filed: February 4, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2009 18 Featured Case ORDER continuing motions to 4/24/09. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/12/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
April 21, 2009 23 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS: Defendant's answers are due no later than 5/1/09. The Court also advises defendant Darba Enterprises, Inc. that it must get an attorney to represent it before it appears before the Court again. If it does not retain counsel, the Court may enter default judgment against it. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2009: # 1 cs) (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2009 36 Featured Case ORDER granting extension re 27 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 6, 2009 38 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
May 7, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Illston granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 15, 2009 51 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
June 11, 2009 62 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
July 6, 2009 64 Featured Case ***ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT***ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/2/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009) Modified on 7/6/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2009 65 Featured Case CLOSING ORDER : Stipulated Dismissal without prejudice. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The American Automobile Association, Inc. v. Darba Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Represented By: Erin C Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darba Enterprises, INc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Bagnuolo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]