Lechuga v. Laborers International Union Local Union 304

Plaintiff: Jose Lechuga
Defendant: Laborers International Union Local Union 304
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv01601
Filed: April 13, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Reporting/Disclosure Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME. Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and defendant's motion to dismiss shall both be heard on May 29, 2009 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall have up to and including May 15, 2009 to file a response to defendant's motion to dismiss, and defendant shall have up to and including May 20, 2009 to file a reply. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
June 11, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
April 15, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lechuga v. Laborers International Union Local Union 304
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lechuga
Represented By: Paul Ham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborers International Union Local Union 304
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]