Domnitz v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Domnitz
Defendant: Warehouse Demo Services, Inc. and Costco Wholesale Corp., Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv05305
Filed: November 6, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 15, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 21, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO FILING OF REVISED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. The Revised First Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by plaintiffs on April 9, 2010, is deemed the operative complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 21, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
June 9, 2010 28 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE PRIVATE MEDIATION. The deadline to complete private mediation is extended to August 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 9, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 22, 2010 29 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER AND RELATED ACTION. Plaintiff is directed to file and serve no later than June 28, 2010 a copy of the "Notice of Pendency of Other and Related Action" plaintiff's counsel filed in Taddei v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc., C 10-0765 WHA, in this action, after which the Court will consider whether the cases should be related. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 22, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
August 12, 2010 32 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. Domnitz v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc., C 09-5305 MMC, is related to Taddei v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc., C 10-0765 WHA. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 12, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
November 2, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER RE. FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Pursuant to stipulation, Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint; Defendant shall not be required to answer the Second Amended Complaint, and all denials, responses, and affirmative defenses contained in the answer filed by the Defendant to the original complaint shall be responsive to the revised Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/2/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 10, 2010 37 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES. The cases Domnitz v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc., N.D. Cal. Case No. CV-9-5305 MMC and Martin v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc., N.D. Cal. Case No. 10-CV-4539-EMC are related pursuant to Local Rule 3-12. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
January 18, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER RE: STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING CASES. Pursuant to stipulation, the actions are consolidated for purposes of class action settlement approval, briefing, scheduling, discovery, pretrial proceedings, trial, class certifications, and any post-trial motions or proceedings. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/18/11. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
March 25, 2011 43 Featured Case ORDER VACATING APRIL 1, 2011 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 25, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
April 1, 2011 44 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2011. (Attachment # 1 Exhibit 1) (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
April 1, 2011 45 Featured Case ORDER RE: PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 1, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
May 27, 2011 48 Featured Case ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO CONTINUE FILING DATE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. The deadline for plaintiffs to file any motion for an award of fees, expenses, and incentive awards, and to provide access to any such motion on the website is exten ded to June 6, 2011. No later than Tuesday, May 31, 2011, plaintiffs shall post on the website a notice stating that any motion for an award of fees, expenses, and incentive awards will be available on the website no later than June 6, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 27, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
July 8, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING REMINDER POSTCARD NOTICE TO THE CLASS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
October 25, 2011 67 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING MICHAEL HOFFMAN AND JACQUELINE DOMNITZ TO ATTEND NOVEMBER 4, 2011 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
November 4, 2011 75 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Michael Hoffman is relieved as counsel of record for plaintiff Jacqueline Domnitz. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 4, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
December 9, 2011 81 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT A TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AMANDA MYETTE; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANT. Defendant is ordered to file Exhibit A under seal in accordance with General Order No. 62. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 14, 2011 85 Featured Case FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 14, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Domnitz v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Domnitz
Represented By: Michael Hoffman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warehouse Demo Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley W. Kampas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp., Inc.
Represented By: Christian Joseph Rowley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]