Datel Holdings Ltd. et al v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Datel Holdings Ltd. and Datel Design & Development, Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv05535
Filed: November 20, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 114 Letter filed by Datel Holdings Ltd., Datel Design & Development, Inc., 113 Letter filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 14, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 17, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendant's Motion to Compel 80 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
March 11, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
March 21, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting as Modified re 132 Stipulated Request for Expedited Briefing and Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 21, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring Response to re 134 Defendant's Administrative Motion Pursuant to Local Rules 7-11 and 16-2 (D) for an Order Temporarily Continuing Deadline For Motions to Compel While Motion For Schedule Adjustment is Decided Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 21, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 22, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying re 134 Administrative Motion to Continue the Deadlines to File Motions to Compel. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 30, 2011 155 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST EXTENDING THE TIME FOR DATEL TO MOVE TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS WITHHELD BY MICROSOFT ON GROUNDS OF PRIVILEGE OR WORK PRODUCT PROTECTION, re doc 144 filed by Datel Holdings Ltd., Datel Design & Development, Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/30/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
April 8, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 8, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
June 6, 2011 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/2/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 17, 2011 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SHIFTING FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/17/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
July 15, 2011 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting 246 defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 29, 2011 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 07/29/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 29, 2011 283 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/29/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
August 2, 2011 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR SECOND ROUND OF MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/01/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 2, 2011 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 282 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief Amici Curiae In Support of Datel's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/01/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
August 4, 2011 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY; re 290 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/04/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
September 14, 2011 329 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 328 Stipulation, filed by Datel Holdings Ltd., Microsoft Corporation, Datel Design & Development, Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 14, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
April 23, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
May 24, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 24, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
October 26, 2011 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY re 358 Proposed Order filed by Datel Holdings Ltd., Datel Design & Development, Inc.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 26, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
November 2, 2011 390 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SECOND STIPULATED AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL: Expert Witness Discovery due by 11/11/2011. Third Round of Motion for Summary Judgment to be filed by 11/15/2011. Responses due by 12/9/2011. Replies due by 12/23/2011. Third Motion for Summary Judgment set for 1/18/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/2/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
June 18, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Stipulation filed by Datel Holdings Ltd., Datel Design & Development, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 6/18/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2010)
July 21, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 20, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
August 27, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Stipulation, filed by Microsoft Corporation, Datel Design & Development, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 27, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
October 4, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 44 Motion to Bifurcate (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
January 6, 2011 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 69 Stipulated Request. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 6, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
January 13, 2011 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 83 Stipulation, filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 12, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Datel Holdings Ltd. et al v. Microsoft Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Datel Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Robert Hallman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Datel Design & Development, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Hallman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]