Cataphora, Inc. v. Parker et al

Plaintiff: Cataphora, Inc.
Defendant: Jerrold Seth Parker, Dawn M. Barrios, Victor Manuel Diaz, Ben Gordon, Daniel E. Becnel, Jr., Ervin Amanda Gonzalez, Hugh P. Lambert, Arnold Levine, Christopher Seeger, Scott Weinstein, Gerald E. Meunier, James Robert Reeves, Bruce William Steckler, Russ M. Herman and Leonard Davis
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv05749
Filed: December 8, 2009
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2011 125 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
June 9, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/9/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 20, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST RE DOCKET NO. 131. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/20/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 30, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD ORDER RE EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/30/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
July 22, 2011 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 132 Motion for Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
August 16, 2011 197 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 25, 2011 211 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS 84-87. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/25/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
September 2, 2011 224 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AUTHORIZING ADMITTANCE OF EQUIPMENT FOR TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/2/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 8, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court REFRESHMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 19, 2011 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FURNISH JURY LUNCH. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/16/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 28, 2011 255 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman finding as moot 253 Ex-Parte Application. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
October 3, 2011 260 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/3/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
March 17, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO COMPLY WITH RULE 26(f) OBLIGATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/17/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
December 27, 2011 312 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 278 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 279 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 280 Motion for New Trial (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
January 4, 2012 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and deferring motion for costs 267 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 268 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 5, 2012 317 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/5/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 6, 2012 319 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT CORRECTING NAME OF DEFENDANT.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/6/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 11, 2012 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 321 Request for approval to post cash superseadeas bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/11/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 20, 2012 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting plaintiff nontaxable costs (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 24, 2012 346 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER re 315 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/24/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
March 2, 2012 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 322 Motion for Attorney Fees (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 15, 2012 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY AND DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 355 Motion to Stay (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
June 22, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/22/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
March 23, 2012 366 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY WITHOUT POSTING ADDITIONAL SECURITY re 355 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment filed by Bruce William Steckler, Hugh P. Lambert, Arnold Levin, Christopher Seeger, James Robert Reeves, Er vin Amanda Gonzalez, Scott Weinstein, Gerald E. Meunier, Jerrold Seth Parker, Russ M. Herman, Victor Manuel Diaz, Daniel E. Becnel, Jr., Dawn M. Barrios, Ben Gordon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/23/2012. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
January 23, 2014 373 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DIRECTING COURT CLERK TO RELEASE FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH COURT REGISTRY. Amended Judgment and Award of Damages and Attorneys' Fees and Costs has been Satisfied in Full. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/23/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
September 16, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
October 29, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
November 12, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 65 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 17, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cataphora, Inc. v. Parker et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cataphora, Inc.
Represented By: William Webb Farrer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrold Seth Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn M. Barrios
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Manuel Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gordon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin Amanda Gonzalez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh P. Lambert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Levine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Seeger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Weinstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald E. Meunier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Reeves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce William Steckler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russ M. Herman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]