Wade v. Contra Costa Community College District et al

Plaintiff: E. K. Wade
Defendant: Contra Costa Community College District, Diablo Valley College, Christine Garcia and Stacy Shears
Case Number: 3:2009cv05959
Filed: December 21, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Welfare
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/8/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 12, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC & RELATED DEADLINES re 18 Stipulation filed by Contra Costa Community College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2010: # 1 Certificate of Service) (mejlc1, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/6/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/29/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/16/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 30, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CMC & RELATED DEADLINES re 27 Stipulation filed by Helen Benjamin, Anthony T. Gordon, Contra Costa Community College District, Judy Walters. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/30/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2010: # 1 Certificate of Service) (mejlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 8 Stipulation filed by Contra Costa Community College District. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Contra Costa Community College District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. K. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa Community College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diablo Valley College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Shears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.