Halton Co v. Streivor Inc

Plaintiff: Halton Co
Defendant: Streivor Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00655
Filed: February 16, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING TO MAY 27 AT 8:00 A.M.. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 7, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2010)
May 21, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 19 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
June 3, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 3, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
February 24, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 8 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Halton Co v. Streivor Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halton Co
Represented By: Richard Gregory Frenkel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streivor Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]