Lowy et al v. Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Peter Lowy, Janine Lowy and Beverly Park Corporation
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv00767
Filed: February 23, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
 
Nature of Suit: Appeal of Fee Determination
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND LIMITED DISCOVERY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
October 5, 2011 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING MOTION (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 27, 2011 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
November 28, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING MARCH 30, 2011 ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/28/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lowy et al v. Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lowy
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janine Lowy
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Park Corporation
Represented By: Pamela J. Marple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]