Rodriguez et al v. Service Employees International Union Local 87 et al

Plaintiff: Maxima Carolina Rodriguez, Elsa Acevedo, Olga Loaiza, Raquel Martinez, Mario Suarez and Francisco Garcia
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Local 87, Service Employees International Union, Olga Miranda, Ahmed Abozayd and Hung Chi Szeto
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv01377
Filed: April 1, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Reporting/Disclosure
Cause of Action: 29:0401 Labor Management Disclosure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 78 Motion to Dismiss; denying 80 Motion for Sanctions; and dismissing Plaintiffs' complaint with prejudice. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
May 25, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, up to and including 7/2/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/25/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
June 22, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RESCHEDULE THE HEARING DATE FOR THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference re-set for 8/27/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/22/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
September 1, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 29 Motion for Sanctions without prejudice (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
November 23, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
January 3, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 69 Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 3, 2011. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
July 29, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING, 95 Stipulation by Parties For Extension of Time to File Response and Reply to Dft's Motion for Sanctions. re 80 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Service Employees International Union Local 87. Responses due by 8/12/2011. Replies due by 8/19/2011.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rodriguez et al v. Service Employees International Union Local 87 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxima Carolina Rodriguez
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Acevedo
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga Loaiza
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Martinez
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Suarez
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Garcia
Represented By: Arlo Garcia Uriarte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Local 87
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olga Miranda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Abozayd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hung Chi Szeto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]