Apple Inc. v. Eastman Kodak Company

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv01609
Filed: April 15, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2010 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 2, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh and Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings., Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Lucy H. Koh and Hon. Lucy H. Koh. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Executive Commiittee on 8/2/10. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
June 17, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Motion to Stay (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 14, 2010 24 Declaration in Support of 23 MOTION to Stay AND STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 23 ) (Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 23 MOTION to Stay AND STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY filed by Eastman Kodak Company. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 14, 2010 22 NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Company of MOTION AND STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. Section 1659(a) (Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 28, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 18 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2010 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 21 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2010 09:00 AM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 26, 2010 20 Declaration of Rachel R. Davidson in Support of 18 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit D (cont), # 6 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 19 Declaration of John Blake, Jr. in Support of 18 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed byEastman Kodak Company. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 26, 2010 18 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Eastman Kodak Company. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Proposed Order)(Davidson, Rachel) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 13, 2010 17 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 02:30 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 11, 2010 15 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 10, 2010 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of David T. McDonald ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611045645.) filed by Eastman Kodak Company. (Attachments: # 1 receipt, # 2 proposed order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 5, 2010 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re 8 Notice of Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Apple Inc. Eastman Kodak Company served on 4/15/2010, answer due 5/6/2010. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 3, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/30/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 29, 2010 9 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Eastman Kodak Company. (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 28, 2010 8 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge (Ferguson, Brian) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 26, 2010 7 Featured Case ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 4/26/10,granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Brian E. Ferguson. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 23, 2010 6 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Brian E. Ferguson Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611045014) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 21, 2010 5 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due 5/5/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 16, 2010 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 15, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 2 Summons Issued as to Eastman Kodak Company. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 15, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial; Certification of Interested Entities or Persons against Eastman Kodak Company (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 54611007170). Filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Eastman Kodak Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Steven S. Cherensky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]