Yates v. Cafe Gratitude LLC et al

Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Defendant: Cafe Gratitude LLC and Robert A. Imhoff
Case Number: 3:2010cv02015
Filed: May 10, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Status Report due by 1/10/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/20/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
April 17, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Status Report due by 5/3/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/17/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
May 2, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Stipulation of Dismissal (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Cafe Gratitude LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Represented By: Thomas E. Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cafe Gratitude LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Imhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.