SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC et al v. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC and Innovative Interfaces, Inc.
Defendant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv03305
Filed: July 28, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
 
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2010 28 Transferred case to USDC-Southern Ohio. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 27 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Transferred case to USDC-Southern Ohio, Cincinnati. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2010 26 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 16 Motion to Transfer Venue.(jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 4, 2010 25 Reply Memorandum re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Defendant's Reply in Further Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue filed byOCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
September 27, 2010 24 Request for Judicial Notice re 20 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Related document(s) 20 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 23 DECLARATION in Opposition to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of James Hofbauer filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 22 DECLARATION in Opposition to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Leslie Straus filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 21 DECLARATION in Opposition to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Mary Jo Shartsis filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 27, 2010 20 Memorandum in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue filed byInnovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 13, 2010 19 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE -Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue., ORDER Responses due by 9/27/2010. Replies due by 10/4/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 09/13/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated pursuant to the filing of the motion (Duplicate deadlines) 16 MOTION to Transfer Case. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. for OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. Defendant's Certificate of Interested Persons or Entities (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 17 Declaration of Bruce Crocco in Support of 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue MOTION to Change Venue Declaration of Bruce Crocco in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S. C. Section 1404(A) filed byOCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 16 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authoriies in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, MOTION to Change Venue filed by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 2, 2010 15 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 24, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James A. Wilson (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 11 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation Deferring Response Date and Setting Briefing Schedule on Transfer Motion. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 13 Proposed Order re 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611049597.) by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-James A. Wilson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611049597.) filed by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 13, 2010 10 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Deferring Response Date and Setting Briefing Schedule on Transfer Motion by OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 9 Featured Case INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 6, 2010 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/6/10. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Innovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC and Request for Reassignment To A United States District Judge. (Shartsis, Mary) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 30, 2010 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc. served on 7/29/2010, answer due 8/19/2010. (Schaberg, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 28, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 28, 2010 4 Certificate of Interested Persons or Entities filed by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Gerald M. Kline for Innovative Interfaces, Inc., SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 1/3/2011 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 1/10/2011 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc..(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 1 COMPLAINT for Federal & State Antitrust Violations, Unfair Competition & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611048637] Filed by Plaintiffs Innovative Interfaces, Inc. & SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC et al v. OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SkyRiver Technology Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Simone Marie Katz-O'Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Interfaces, Inc.
Represented By: Simone Marie Katz-O'Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCLC Online Computer Library Center, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]