On the Cheap, LLC v. Does 1-5011

Plaintiff: On the Cheap, LLC
Defendant: Does 1-5011
Case Number: 3:2010cv04472
Filed: October 4, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 6 Ex Parte Application (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
April 22, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 11 Motion to Vacate (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
May 23, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/23/2011. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 26, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER RE DOE 406'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/26/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2011: # 1 Proof of Service) (bzsec, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH BRIEFING ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/23/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 24, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/24/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/27/2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/24/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
August 18, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 52 Motion for Leave to File (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
September 1, 2011 60 Opinion or Order of the Court FIFTH BRIEFING ORDER Re Motions To Quash Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
September 6, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY DOE 70.109.224.221. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/6/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SERVING DOE DEFENDANTS 1-16 AND 18-5011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/6/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 12, 2011 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/12/2011. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER QUASHING SUBPOENAS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/12/2011. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 28, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part re 86 Plaintiff's Request for Miscellaneous Relief. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
October 26, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING CIVIL CASE ADMINISTRATIVELY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/26/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011) Modified on 10/26/2011 (bzsec, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: On the Cheap, LLC v. Does 1-5011
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: On the Cheap, LLC
Represented By: Ira M. Siegel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5011
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]