Terraphase Engineering Inc. et al v. Arcadis, U.S., Inc.

Plaintiff: Terraphase Engineering Inc., William Carson, Jeff Raines, Peter Zawislanski and Andrew Romolo
Defendant: Arcadis, U.S., Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2010cv04647
Filed: October 14, 2010
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2010 16 Featured Case ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 8, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 16, 2010 22 Featured Case NOTICE OF QUESTIONS for Hearing re 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 17, 2010 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
January 3, 2011 33 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 28 Dismissal Without Prejudice of Arcadis U.S., Inc.'s First Counter-Claim. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011) Modified on 1/3/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE for James E. Kellett. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 13, 2011 51 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/13/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 13, 2011 54 Featured Case ORDER to Show Cause re Appointment of Special Master. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 13, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
January 20, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER Appointing Special Master. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 20, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
April 18, 2011 85 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 81 Stipulation TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
May 2, 2011 88 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 87 Stipulation. Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 2, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 6, 2011 90 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 89 Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/6/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Terraphase Engineering Inc. et al v. Arcadis, U.S., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terraphase Engineering Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Carson
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Raines
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Zawislanski
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Romolo
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcadis, U.S., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]