Facebook Inc. v. Lamebook LLC Featured Case

Plaintiff: Facebook Inc.
Defendant: Lamebook LLC
Case Number: 3:2010cv05048
Filed: November 8, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2011 35 STIPULATION re Dismissal Without Prejudice by Facebook Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/21/2011)
June 14, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated*** Motion Hearing date of 04/21/2011 Date Terminated 30 Stipulation and Order, Set Hearings. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 13, 2011 34 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 1, 2011 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 6/2/11 has been rescheduled to 6/30/11 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 5, 2011 33 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/5/2011 before Judge Richard Seeborg (Date Filed: 5/5/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 7/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2011)
April 28, 2011 32 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (UPDATED) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 4/28/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 6/2/11 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 18, 2011 31 CLERKS NOTICE MOTION HEARING WILL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b).(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
March 29, 2011 30 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON LAMEBOOK LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS.Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 29 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on Lamebook LLC's Motion to Dimiss by Facebook and by Lamebook LLC. (Rosloff, Genevieve) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 23, 2011 28 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING TIME ON MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2011 12:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 17, 2011 27 REPLY (re 18 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byLamebook LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 10, 2011 26 Declaration of Jeffrey T. Norberg in Support of 25 Opposition/Response to Motion To Dismiss filed byFacebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 10, 2011 25 RESPONSE (re 18 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byFacebook Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
February 28, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 2/28/11. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 4/28/11 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that all parties shall call 218-339-2500 access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 28, 2011 24 CLERKS NOTICE Telephonic Case Management Conference continued to 5/5/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 25, 2011 23 CLERKS NOTICE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 3, 2011 AT 10:00 A.M. SHALL BE CONDUCTED BY TELEPHONE.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 24, 2011 22 MOTION to Appear by Telephone AT MARCH 3, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (JOSEPH C. GRATZ) filed by Lamebook LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 21 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 24, 2011 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lamebook LLC (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/24/2011) Modified on 2/28/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2011 19 Declaration of Joseph C. Gratz in Support of 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed byLamebook LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 18 ) (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lamebook LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 10, 2011 17 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 2/28/11 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 26, 2011 16 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 15 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 14 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 21, 2011 13 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER by Lamebook LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
December 14, 2010 12 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond CORRECTION OF DOCKET# 11 by Lamebook LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 14, 2010 11 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 12 . *** STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time to Answer by Lamebook LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/14/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER RE: 9 REASSIGNING CASE TO JUDGE SEEBORG.Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/6/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 3, 2010 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 30, 2010 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 7 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER by Lamebook LLC. (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 23, 2010 6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Facebook Inc.. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 17, 2010 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Facebook Inc. Lamebook LLC served on 11/9/2010, answer due 11/30/2010. (Norberg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/17/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2010 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 8, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Facebook Inc. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Lamebook LLC (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611008455). Filed by Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook Inc. v. Lamebook LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Gavin Lewis Charlston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamebook LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]