Strata Auction LLC v. Trammel et al

Plaintiff: Strata Auction LLC
Defendant: Sylvia A Trammel and Janet M. Villanueva
Case Number: 3:2011cv00766
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Economic Stabilization Act
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/6/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
April 18, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/19/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/18/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
February 25, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court Filed in error - please disregard
February 25, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/25/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
March 22, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/22/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strata Auction LLC v. Trammel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strata Auction LLC
Represented By: Richard Hobin
Represented By: Cheryl Christine Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia A Trammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet M. Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.