Henry v. State of Alaska Department of Revenue Child Support Services Division et al

Defendant: State of California Department of Child Support Services, United States Department of Health and Human Services Office of Child Support Enforcement, United States Department of State and State of Alaska Department of Revenue Child Support Services Division
Plaintiff: Ronald Henry
Case Number: 3:2011cv03255
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 9 Request filed by Ronald Henry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/17/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
September 19, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 13 Request filed by Ronald Henry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
December 1, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DISMISSING STATE OF ALASKA AS A DEFENDANT AND (2) STAYING THE CLAIMS AGAINST THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Dkt. Nos. 16 & 23). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 12/1/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RESCHEDULE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Dkt. No. 29). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 1/24/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO WITHDRAW CONSENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND 2) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES IS A PROPER DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION (Dkt. Nos. 26, 35). Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 5, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO WITHDRAW CONSENT TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND 2) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES IS A PROPER DEFENDANT IN THIS ACTION (Dkt. Nos. 26, 35). Signed by magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/5/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 19, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying 42 Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
May 1, 2012 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Dkt. No. 44). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/1/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2012: # 1 Certificate of Service) (ahm, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (Dkt. No. 48). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/3/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 31, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/31/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. State of Alaska Department of Revenue Child Support Services Division et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California Department of Child Support Services
Represented By: Lisa Anne Tillman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services Office of Child Support Enforcement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska Department of Revenue Child Support Services Division
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]