Hegger v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Tami Hegger
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, Medela Inc. Long Term Disability Plan and Medela Inc Life Insurance Waiver or Premium Plan
Case Number: 3:2011cv04229
Filed: August 25, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date; Order filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America, et al. re 23 Case Management Conference - Further, Set Motion Hearings. Motion Hearing reset for 11/16/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/18/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
November 5, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
November 14, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING PENDING MOTIONS (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
December 14, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
January 29, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND SETTING HEARING DATE by Judge Alsup granting 48 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
February 11, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO STRIKE, Motions terminated: 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 53 MOTION to Strike : Defendants' Notice of Motion To Strike and Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Hearing Pursuant to Nolan v. Heald College and Consideration of Extrinsic Evidence to Determine filed by Tami Hegger., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 53 MOTION to Strike : Defendants' Notice of M otion To Strike and Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Hearing Pursuant to Nolan v. Heald College and Consideration of Extrinsic Evidence to Determine, 53 MOTION to Strike : Defendants' Notice of Motion To Strike and Objection t o Plaintiff's Request for Hearing Pursuant to Nolan v. Heald College and Consideration of Extrinsic Evidence to Determine the Standard of Review; Supporting Declar. Responses due by 2/15/2013. Replies due by 2/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 11, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
March 1, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AFTER BENCH TRIAL by Judge Alsup denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; deferring ruling on 53 Motion to Strike (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
March 1, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2013)
April 9, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING FEE REQUEST, CONFIRMING COSTS, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot 74 Stipulation (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hegger v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Hegger
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Represented By: Daniel J Aguilar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medela Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Daniel J Aguilar
Represented By: Susan M Benton
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medela Inc Life Insurance Waiver or Premium Plan
Represented By: Daniel J Aguilar
Represented By: Susan M Benton
Represented By: Anna M. Martin
Represented By: William Bernard Reilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]