Pessano et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Jon Pessano, Nicholas Lawrence and Sid Lajzer
Defendant: Google, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv04241
Filed: August 24, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2011 15 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/23/11, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
September 21, 2011 14 Featured Case AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER AND AGENDA FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Correction of time of hearing). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 21, 2011 13 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER AND AGENDA FOR INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/21/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
August 30, 2011 12 CLERKS NOTICE Advising Counsel of Receipt of the Action Jon Pessano, et al v. Google, Inc. from the Middle District of Florida. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 26, 2011 11 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:11-cv-01026. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2011 10 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Eastern District of Michigan MDL case number: 2264 (JLH)
July 27, 2011 9 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER pursuant to 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Sid Lajzer, Jon Pessano, Nicholas Lawrence that these defendants are dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/27/2011. (SN)
July 26, 2011 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Only of Defendants Pandora, AdMob and Traffic Marketplace by Sid Lajzer, Nicholas Lawrence, Jon Pessano (Mayer, Aaron)
June 9, 2011 7 Featured Case ENDORSED ORDER STAYING CASE pursuant to Stipulation (Doc. 6). This case is hereby stayed pending a resolution by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Google's Motion to Transfer of Actions to the United States Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 6/9/2011. (TJD)
June 9, 2011 6 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending MDL Transfer Decision by Sid Lajzer, Nicholas Lawrence, Jon Pessano. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' signature page)(Mayer, Aaron)
June 7, 2011 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs.(Mayer, Aaron)
May 13, 2011 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 3 (CLM)
May 11, 2011 3 Featured Case STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 5/11/2011. (CH)
May 10, 2011 2 Summons issued as to Google, Inc. (CH)
May 10, 2011 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $350 receipt number TPA5102) filed by Jon Pessano, Nicholas Lawrence, Sid Lajzer. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pessano et al v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Pessano
Represented By: Aaron C. Mayer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Lawrence
Represented By: Aaron C. Mayer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sid Lajzer
Represented By: Aaron C. Mayer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]