Nicholaw v. Board of Supervisors

Defendant: Board of Supervisors
Plaintiff: Andy Nicholaw
Case Number: 3:2011cv04272
Filed: August 29, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 20, 2011. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2011: # 1 Cert Serve) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 9, 2012. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2012: # 1 Cert Serve) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Dismissing Complaint with Leave to Amend (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
November 22, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 22, 2011. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2011: # 1 Cert Serve) (klhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholaw v. Board of Supervisors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Supervisors
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Nicholaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]