Xilinx, Inc v. Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Xilinx, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC, Intellectual Ventures, LLC, Latrosse Technologies, LLC, Roldan Block NY, LLC, Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC, TR Technologies Foundation, LLC, Taichi Holdings, LLC, Noregin Assets N.V., LLC and Detelle Relay KG, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv04407 |
Filed: |
September 2, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Francisco Office |
County: |
Santa Clara |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Illston |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 16, 2012 |
Filing
94
ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/16/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
|
October 25, 2011 |
Filing
55
ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Xilinx, Inc v. Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Xilinx, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Behrooz Shariati |
Represented By: |
Laurie Michelle Charrington |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Intellectual Ventures Management, LLC |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Intellectual Ventures, LLC |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Latrosse Technologies, LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Roldan Block NY, LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Intellectual Ventures Funding, LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TR Technologies Foundation, LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Taichi Holdings, LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Noregin Assets N.V., LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Detelle Relay KG, LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradford John Black |
Represented By: |
Peter H. Chang |
Represented By: |
Andrew Grant Hamill |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?