Canadian National Railway Company v. Phoenix Logistics, Inc.

Defendant: Phoenix Logistics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Canadian National Railway Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv04589
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 telephonic appearance, filed by Canadian National Railway Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
April 4, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND/OR EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
April 19, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment in the amount of $151,834.14. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
December 20, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 6 Letter filed by John K. Fiorilla Canadian National Railway Company Initial Case Management Conference Rescheduled to 2/2/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/20/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canadian National Railway Company v. Phoenix Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: John Kenneth Fiorilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.