Campbell et al v. City of Oakland et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Scott Campbell, Kerie Campbell, Marcus Kryshka, Marc McKinnie, Michael Siegel and American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Defendant: City of Oakland and Howard Jordan
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv05498
Filed: November 14, 2011
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2011 21 Featured Case ORDER Re Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/14/2011. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 16, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 11/30/2011 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/16/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 23, 2011 39 Featured Case ORDER denying motion to relate cases. This case is not related to Case Nos. C00-4599 TEH, C03-2961 TEH, C03-2962 TEH, or C11-2867 TEH. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/23/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
February 24, 2012 59 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beeler for Settlement. Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 5/28/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/28/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 62 Featured Case ORDER RESETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: re 61 Stipulation filed by Timothy Scott Campbell. Settlement Conference reset to 9/18/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The previous set date of June 1, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 5/23/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
June 11, 2012 64 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 63 FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/11/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
July 25, 2012 66 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 65 FOR AN ORDER EXTENDING DATE FOR AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
September 18, 2012 68 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/18/2012. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
September 28, 2012 70 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 69 FOR NEW SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 2/24/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 2/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
November 8, 2012 71 Featured Case ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 12/19/2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/8/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 28, 2012 73 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/28/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
July 25, 2013 88 Featured Case FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND FOR SEALING AND DESTRUCTION OF ARREST RECORDS re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Timothy Scott Campbell. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Campbell et al v. City of Oakland et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Scott Campbell
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerie Campbell
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Represented By: Alan Lawrence Schlosser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Kryshka
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Represented By: Alan Lawrence Schlosser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc McKinnie
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Siegel
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Robert Michael Flynn
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: Rachel Lederman
Represented By: Carol A. Sobel
Represented By: Bobbie Fay Stein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Represented By: James B. Chanin
Represented By: Julie M. Houk
Represented By: Linda Lye
Represented By: Michael Temple Risher
Represented By: Alan Lawrence Schlosser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oakland
Represented By: Rocio V. Fierro
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Represented By: Randolph W. Hall
Represented By: Barbara J. Parker
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Jordan
Represented By: Rocio V. Fierro
Represented By: Gregory Mellon Fox
Represented By: Randolph W. Hall
Represented By: Barbara J. Parker
Represented By: William Edmond Simmons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]