Young v. North American Van Lines, Inc.

Plaintiff: Terra S. Young
Defendant: North American Van Lines, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00257
Filed: January 17, 2012
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 31 MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/25/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
July 25, 2012 55 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/10/2012.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
January 23, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
March 22, 2013 69 Featured Case ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 7, 2012 9 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Young v. North American Van Lines, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terra S. Young
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Van Lines, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]